WA SB6420 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning underground utilities and safety committee.
Title
Concerning underground utilities and safety committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 162, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2694 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.