WA SB6420 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying certain land capacity review and evaluation requirements.
Title
Modifying certain land capacity review and evaluation requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | GOS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 5:45 PM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |