WA SB6371 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the definition of "agency" for purposes of early learning programs.
Title
Concerning the definition of "agency" for purposes of early learning programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] |
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 231, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-23 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2671 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.