WA SB6362 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying basic education provisions.
Title
Modifying basic education provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018*. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 266, 2018 Laws PV. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 25; nays, 23; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-14 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2721 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.