WA HB2721 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying basic education provisions.
Title
Modifying basic education provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB6362 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2721&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2721.pdf |