WA SB6352 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying provisions on personal property exempt from execution, attachment, and garnishment.
Title
Modifying provisions on personal property exempt from execution, attachment, and garnishment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-10 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |