WA SB6351 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the health care authority to require fingerprint-based background checks and conviction record checks for the nonemergency medical transportation program.
Title
Authorizing the health care authority to require fingerprint-based background checks and conviction record checks for the nonemergency medical transportation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-23 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |