WA SB6314 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the existing state property tax exemption for residences of senior citizens and disabled persons to local regular property taxes.
Title
Extending the existing state property tax exemption for residences of senior citizens and disabled persons to local regular property taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Local Government. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2597 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.