WA HB2597 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the existing state property tax exemption for residences of senior citizens and disabled persons to local regular property taxes.
Title
Extending the existing state property tax exemption for residences of senior citizens and disabled persons to local regular property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-13 | House | Chapter 46, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2018-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB6314 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.