WA SB6309 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Including persons acquitted by reason of insanity within the slayer statute.
Title
Including persons acquitted by reason of insanity within the slayer statute.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-10 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-27 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3110 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.