WA SB6286 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reimbursement of correctional employees for offender assaults.
Title
Concerning reimbursement of correctional employees for offender assaults.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Pearson [R] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Chapter 8, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-26 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to General Government & Information Technology |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass LAW 16 bill proposed by Law & Justice. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |