WA SB6267 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning notice to the licensee before a concealed pistol license expires.
Title
Concerning notice to the licensee before a concealed pistol license expires.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-03-08 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |