WA SB6263 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a model educational data sharing agreement between school districts and tribes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a model educational data sharing agreement between school districts and tribes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-27SenateChapter 206, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-10SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-03HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-27HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-25HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2020-02-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-02-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-11SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-07SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6263&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6263.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6263.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6263.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121147&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-13-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6263&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121147&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6263&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121147&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6263&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback