WA SB6238 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Requiring local ballot measure statement committee members to be registered voters in the jurisdiction voting on the measure. )
Title
(REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Requiring local ballot measure statement committee members to be registered voters in the jurisdiction voting on the measure. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |