WA SB6233 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing step therapy protocols for prescription drugs.
Title
Addressing step therapy protocols for prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |