WA SB6227 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 3/31/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 3/31/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing the recommendations of the 2015 review of the Washington wildlife and recreation program.
Title
Implementing the recommendations of the 2015 review of the Washington wildlife and recreation program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 3/31/2016. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 149, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2016-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-29 | House | CB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:30 AM. |
2016-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 1. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | NRP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2509 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.