WA SB6217 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding nuclear power generation in the state plan submitted to the United States environmental protection agency under the clean power plan.
Title
Regarding nuclear power generation in the state plan submitted to the United States environmental protection agency under the clean power plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6217&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6217.pdf |