WA SB6217 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Retroactively applying certain intermediate license law amendments made during the 2009 legislative session.
Title
Retroactively applying certain intermediate license law amendments made during the 2009 legislative session.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-26 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-11 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-20 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2528 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.