WA SB6189 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Effective date 3/17/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Effective date 3/17/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying eligibility for school employees' benefits board coverage.
Title
Clarifying eligibility for school employees' benefits board coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Effective date 3/17/2020. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Chapter 8, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-10 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-03-10 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |