WA SB6181 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating insurers and insurance products.
Title
Regulating insurers and insurance products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-01 | FIHI - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-01-31 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-13 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2523 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-30 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6181&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6181.pdf |