WA SB6171 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-14 - Effective date 5/14/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-14 - Effective date 5/14/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning savings in programs under the supervision of the department of health.
Title
Concerning savings in programs under the supervision of the department of health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Effective date 5/14/2009*. | |
2009-05-14 | Chapter 495, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-14 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Passed final passage; yeas, 29; nays, 16; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-26 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-26 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-26 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-26 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-26 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2009-04-26 | Rules suspended. | |
2009-04-26 | House receded from amendments. | |
2009-04-26 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2009-04-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-25 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-25 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-25 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-25 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-25 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 8:30 AM. | |
2009-04-24 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-04-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-23 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-19 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-04-18 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM. | |
2009-04-15 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |