WA SB6168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 4/3/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making 2019-2021 fiscal biennium supplemental operating appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making 2019-2021 fiscal biennium supplemental operating appropriations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03SenateEffective date 4/3/2020.
2020-04-03SenateChapter 357, 2020 Laws PV.
2020-04-03SenateGovernor partially vetoed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-12SenatePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-12SenateConference committee report adopted.
2020-03-12HousePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-12HouseVote on final passage will be reconsidered.
2020-03-12HousePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-12HouseConference committee report adopted.
2020-03-12SenateConference committee report; received 3:00 PM 3/11/2020.
2020-03-11HouseConference committee report; received 2:12 PM 3/11/2020.
2020-03-10HouseConference committee appointed. Representatives Ormsby, Robinson, Stokesbary.
2020-03-10HouseConference committee request granted.
2020-03-03SenateConference committee appointed. Senators Rolfes, Frockt, Braun.
2020-03-03SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon.
2020-02-28HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2020-02-28HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-28HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-28HouseRead first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
2020-02-27SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-27SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-27SenateFloor amendment
2020-02-27Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-25SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-25SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-25SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2325 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6168&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6168.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6168-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6168-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6168-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6168-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120899&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-27-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6168&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120899&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-28-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6168&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120899&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6168&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120899&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6168&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback