WA SB6158 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning model sexual assault protocols for hospitals and clinics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning model sexual assault protocols for hospitals and clinics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-27SenateChapter 202, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-10SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-04HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-25HousePS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2020-02-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-05Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-01-28SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-01-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-22SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6158&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6158.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6158-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6158-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6158-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120889&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6158&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120889&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6158&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120889&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6158&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback