WA SB6150 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning opioid use disorder treatment, prevention, and related services.
Title
Concerning opioid use disorder treatment, prevention, and related services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2489 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.