WA HB2489 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning opioid use disorder treatment, prevention, and related services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning opioid use disorder treatment, prevention, and related services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-02-19SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2018-02-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-09HouseFloor amendment
2018-02-09HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2018-02-09HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2018-02-09House1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-02-02HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-10HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness

Same As/Similar To

SB6150 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback