WA SB6127 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving the management of the state's halibut fishery.
Title
Improving the management of the state's halibut fishery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Chapter 190, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-20 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |