WA SB6122 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning unattended pet animals with a choke chain.
Title
Concerning unattended pet animals with a choke chain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-03 | JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 7:30 PM. | |
2012-02-01 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 5:30 PM. | |
2012-01-11 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |