WA SB6116 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assisting spouses and dependents of active duty military by ensuring affordable access to higher education.
Title
Assisting spouses and dependents of active duty military by ensuring affordable access to higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2019-12-26 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2185 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6116&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6116.pdf |