WA HB2185 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Assisting spouses and dependents of active duty military by ensuring affordable access to higher education.
Title
Assisting spouses and dependents of active duty military by ensuring affordable access to higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-29 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2019-12-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6116 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-23 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.