WA SB6102 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the employee reproductive choice act.
Title
Enacting the employee reproductive choice act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM. |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2908 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-23 - First reading, referred to Judiciary