WA SB6083 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Maintaining public health, safety, and environmental standards.
Title
Maintaining public health, safety, and environmental standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | EENT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6083&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6083.pdf |