WA SB6073 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting assessments levied on hardwood processors.
Title
Adjusting assessments levied on hardwood processors.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2018. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Chapter 71, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-15 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2553 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.