WA SB6064 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring full body scanners at each department of corrections institution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring full body scanners at each department of corrections institution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-02-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2020-02-19SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-19Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-11SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-11SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-06SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-05SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-05SenateHSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2019-12-10SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback