WA SB6064 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning efficiency updates for capital budget appropriations allocated for public art.
Title
Concerning efficiency updates for capital budget appropriations allocated for public art.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |