WA SB6053 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing wage liens.
Title
Establishing wage liens.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |