WA SB6025 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 4/30/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 4/30/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning bump-fire stock buy-back program records.
Title
Concerning bump-fire stock buy-back program records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Effective date 4/30/2019*. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Chapter 239, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-28 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-04-28 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2182 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.