WA HB2182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning bump-fire stock buy-back program records.
Title
Concerning bump-fire stock buy-back program records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-24 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6025 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Effective date 4/30/2019*.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2182&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2182.pdf |