WA SB6024 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting maximum capital and reserves accumulations by health care service contractors and health maintenance organizations.
Title
Limiting maximum capital and reserves accumulations by health care service contractors and health maintenance organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6024&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6024.pdf |