WA SB6012 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum amount of financial assistance that may be granted or loaned by the department of transportation for airports owned or controlled by municipalities or federally recognized Indian tribes.
Title
Increasing the maximum amount of financial assistance that may be granted or loaned by the department of transportation for airports owned or controlled by municipalities or federally recognized Indian tribes.
Sponsors
Sen. Tracey Eide [D] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Fred Jarrett [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] |
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |