WA SB5993 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying collective bargaining law to authorize providing additional compensation to academic employees at community and technical colleges.
Title
Modifying collective bargaining law to authorize providing additional compensation to academic employees at community and technical colleges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |