WA SB5990 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the uniform emergency volunteer health practitioners act.
Title
Enacting the uniform emergency volunteer health practitioners act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Chapter 184, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-21 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |