WA SB5968 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating home equity sharing agreements under the consumer loan act.
Title
Regulating home equity sharing agreements under the consumer loan act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | BFGT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2081 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 04 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 04 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |