WA SB5946 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - Effective date 9/28/2013*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - Effective date 9/28/2013*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening student educational outcomes.
Title
Strengthening student educational outcomes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-28 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-28 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-28 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-30 | Senate | Effective date 9/28/2013*. |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 18, 2013 Laws 2nd Special Session PV. |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2013-06-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-28 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-06-27 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-06-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM. |
2013-06-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |