WA SB5893 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the administration of motor vehicle excise taxes by regional transit authorities.
Title
Concerning the administration of motor vehicle excise taxes by regional transit authorities.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] |
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-06-16 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2017-06-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-06-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-05 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-07 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2168 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.