WA SB5887 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the public accountancy act.
Title
Modifying the public accountancy act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | BFGT - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade. |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1920 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-07 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 04 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 350 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 380 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 390 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 430 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |