WA SB5878 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring criminal history record checks of current and prospective department of licensing employees who issue or may issue enhanced drivers' licenses and identicards.
Title
Requiring criminal history record checks of current and prospective department of licensing employees who issue or may issue enhanced drivers' licenses and identicards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-05 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1844 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5878&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5878.pdf |