WA HB1844 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring criminal history record checks of current and prospective department of licensing employees who issue or may issue enhanced drivers' licenses and identicards.
Title
Requiring criminal history record checks of current and prospective department of licensing employees who issue or may issue enhanced drivers' licenses and identicards.
Sponsors
Rep. John Driscoll [D] | Sen. Douglas Ericksen [R] | Rep. Frederick Finn [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] |
Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-24 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-24 | Chapter 169, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-22 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-16 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-13 | President signed. | |
2009-04-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2009-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-05 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-16 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-16 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-30 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5878 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.