WA SB5857 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning automatic voter registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning automatic voter registration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateDue to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-27SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback