WA SB5841 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Incentivizing cities and counties to increase employment of commissioned law enforcement officers.
Title
Incentivizing cities and counties to increase employment of commissioned law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] |
Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. James McCune [R] | Sen. Ron Muzzall [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Simon Sefzik [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 101 | 200 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |