WA SB5803 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a presumption of liability for wildfires caused by an electric utility's equipment.
Title
Establishing a presumption of liability for wildfires caused by an electric utility's equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-23 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-02-10 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
76 | 04 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 04 | 760 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |